Julian Depot Miami LLC v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Julian Depot Miami LLC
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22838
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Fant, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
August 19, 2019 Filing 40 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 39 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Julian Depot Miami LLC. (Waldman, Glen)
August 19, 2019 Responses due by 8/19/2019 Replies due by 9/3/2019 Per DE 39 . (vmz)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Plaintiff's motion for leave to file response to the defendant's motion to dismiss #37 . The Plaintiff shall file file its response brief as a separate document by August 19, 2019. Defendant's reply brief is due by September 3, 2019. In the parties filings, they shall state with supporting record citation what portions of the motion to dismiss remain unresolved. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
August 16, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. of Change of Law Firm Name (Gurley, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 37 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Julian Depot Miami LLC. Attorney Glen H. Waldman added to party Julian Depot Miami LLC(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Response)(Waldman, Glen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Allen Azre on behalf of Julian Depot Miami LLC. Attorney Michael Allen Azre added to party Julian Depot Miami LLC(pty:pla). (Azre, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pamela G. Levinson on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Pamela G. Levinson added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft). (Levinson, Pamela)
July 19, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Allen Fant, Jr on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Michael Allen Fant, Jr added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft). (Fant, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David E Gurley on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney David E Gurley added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft). (Gurley, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 32 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Edward M. Fox and Owen Richard Wolfe, mailing date July 11, 2019, (cco)
July 11, 2019 Filing 31 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney J. Ted Donovan, mailing date July 11, 2019, (cco)
July 10, 2019 Filing 30 Bankruptcy Filing of Motion to Withdraw Reference Pursuant to 28 USC 157(d) with District Court (jc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 29 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 28 Case transferred in from Southern District of New York (Manhattan); Case Number - Adversary Proceeding #: 18-01765- SHL. Electronic file consisting of documents numbered 1 to 27, including transfer order and docket sheet received., filed by Julian Depot Miami LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 2 - Summons, #2 DE 3 - Affidavit of Service, #3 DE 4 - Stipulation Extending Time, #4 DE 5 - Notice of Adjournment, #5 DE 6 - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #6 DE 7 - Notice of Motion to Dismiss, #7 DE 8 - Declaration of Edward M. Fox, #8 DE 9 - Declaration of David E. Gurley, #9 DE 10 - Notice of Motion of Defendant to Withdraw the Reference) #10 DE 11 - Civil Cover Sheet, #11 DE 12 - Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc, #12 DE 13 - Declaration of Edward M. Fox, #13 DE 14 - Declaration of David E. Gurley, #14 DE 15 - Civil Cover Sheet, #15 De 16 - Certificate of Service, #16 DE 17 - Stipulation Extending Time, #17 DE 18 - Stipulation Extending Time, #18 DE 19 - Stipulation Extending Time, #19 DE 20 - Signed Endorsed Order, #20 DE 21- Stipulation Extending Time, #21 DE 22 - Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 1/29/19 RE: Case Management Status Conference, #22 DE 23 - Letter to The Honorable Sean H. Lane, dated March 21, 2019, #23 DE - Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/28/2019 RE: Adversary Proceeding; Status Conference Re: Letters, #24 DE 25 - Notice of Adjournment, #25 DE 26 - Order Transferring Adversary Proceeding and Reserving Balance of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Abstain and/or Transfer, #26 DE 27 - Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Withdraw the Reference and Transfer Venue, #27 BANKRUPTCY COURT DOCKET SHEET) (jc). #28 DE 1 - COMPLAINT) (jc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julian Depot Miami LLC v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Owen Richard Wolfe
Represented By: David E Gurley
Represented By: Pamela G. Levinson
Represented By: Edward M. Fox
Represented By: Michael Allen Fant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Depot Miami LLC
Represented By: J. Ted Donovan
Represented By: Michael Allen Azre
Represented By: Glen H. Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?