Weisberg v. Miami Lighthouse For The Blind and Visually Impaired, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tobi Weisberg
Defendant: Miami Lighthouse For The Blind and Visually Impaired, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22856
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Joan A Lenard
Referring Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Miami Lighthouse For The Blind and Visually Impaired, Inc. (Gonzalez-Llorens, Rene)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Miami Lighthouse For The Blind and Visually Impaired, Inc. (Gonzalez-Llorens, Rene)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Tobi Weisberg (Owens, Gregory)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Tobi Weisberg (Owens, Gregory)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 CASE REFERRED to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Discovery Matters. (ls)(per DE #7 )
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 REFERRAL to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan per DE 7. (vjk)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Forth the Court's Policy on Motions for Extension or Stay of the Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 08/13/19. See attached document for full details. (dp)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Referring Discovery Disputes and Certain Pretrial Motions to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan; Directing Parties to File Certificates of Interested Parties; Directing Parties to File a Notice of Refiling And/or of Related Cases; Requiring Completion of Form Consenting to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge; and Requiring Completion of Joint Scheduling Report and Form. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 08/13/19. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix) (dp)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Miami Lighthouse For The Blind and Visually Impaired, Inc.. Attorney Rene J. Gonzalez-Llorens added to party Miami Lighthouse For The Blind and Visually Impaired, Inc.(pty:dft). (Gonzalez-Llorens, Rene)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Vacating DE 4 Order Requiring Certificate of Counsel Regarding Any Prior Filings under the Americans with Disabilities Act. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 07/16/19. (dp)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 "VACATED" Order Requiring Certificate of Counsel Regarding Any Prior Filings under the Americans with Disabilities Act. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 07/15/19. See attached document for full details. (dp) Modified on 7/17/2019 (ls). (Vacated per DE #5)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Miami Lighthouse For The Blind and Visually Impaired, Inc.. (pcs)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miami Lighthouse For The Blind and Visually Impaired, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11802924, filed by Tobi Weisberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit EEOC Charge.Right to Sue Letter)(Owens, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weisberg v. Miami Lighthouse For The Blind and Visually Impaired, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tobi Weisberg
Represented By: Wolfgang M. Florin
Represented By: Gregory Aaron Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Lighthouse For The Blind and Visually Impaired, Inc.
Represented By: Rene J. Gonzalez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?