COLLINS v. QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC
Plaintiff: JUAN COLLINS
Defendant: QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv22864
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to the #8 Motion to Dismiss no later than October 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/6/2019. (smz)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, (Class Allegations) by JUAN COLLINS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Moskowitz, Adam)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jaclyn M. Metzinger. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11946740 by QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Luzadder, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Glenn T. Graham. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11946705 by QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Luzadder, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Geoffrey W. Castello. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11946522 by QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Luzadder, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Quincy Bioscience Holding Company, Inc. for QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC (Luzadder, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, , MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, (Class Allegations) by QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC. Responses due by 9/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn T. Graham in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Luzadder, Matthew)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint no later than August 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/23/2019. (smz)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC. Attorney Matthew Charles Luzadder added to party QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luzadder, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by JUAN COLLINS. QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Moskowitz, Adam)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC. (drz)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11803631, filed by JUAN COLLINS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Moskowitz, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLLINS v. QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN COLLINS
Represented By: Adam M. Moskowitz
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Joseph M. Kaye
Represented By: Howard Mitchell Bushman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC
Represented By: Jaclyn M. Metzinger
Represented By: Geoffrey W. Castello
Represented By: Matthew Charles Luzadder
Represented By: Glenn T. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?