CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. v. DESPOT
Plaintiff: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Defendant: SLOBODAN DESPOT
Case Number: 1:2019cv22890
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. The reply deadline is extended until September 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Respondent's Response in Opposition to the Petition to Vacate Foreign Arbitral Award) re #13 Response/Reply (Other),, by CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.. Responses due by 9/13/2019 (Wylie, Stephanie)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Seal or Redact Petition to Vacate. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. re #7 Defendant's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 (Request for Judicial Notice) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Wylie, Stephanie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 Response in Opposition to Petitioner's Petition to Vacate Foreign Arbitral Award to #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award by SLOBODAN DESPOT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Award, #2 Exhibit Arbitrator Supplemental Disclosure, #3 Exhibit ICDR Letter, #4 Exhibit ICDR Administrative Council Review Standards, #5 Exhibit Response to Article 14 Challenge, #6 Exhibit Michelle Nunez Affidavit, #7 Exhibit March 5, 2019 Email, #8 Exhibit ICDR Order Denying Article 14 Challenge, #9 Exhibit Notice of Appointment, #10 Exhibit Employment Agreement)(Lima, Paulo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Defendant's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 filed by SLOBODAN DESPOT. (Lima, Paulo)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Defendant's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 filed by CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.. Replies due by 8/14/2019. (Wylie, Stephanie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. for dates of September 19 23, 2019 October 10 -14, 2019 November 21 25, 2019 (Horr, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David James Horr on behalf of CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. (Horr, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juan Carlos Perez, Jr on behalf of CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. (Perez, Juan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by SLOBODAN DESPOT. (Lima, Paulo)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer and Consolidate with Previously-Filed Action by SLOBODAN DESPOT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Service Email, #3 Exhibit C - Docket Sheet)(Lima, Paulo)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paulo R. Lima on behalf of SLOBODAN DESPOT. Attorney Paulo R. Lima added to party SLOBODAN DESPOT(pty:dft). (Lima, Paulo)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Koebel Russo on behalf of SLOBODAN DESPOT. Attorney Elizabeth Koebel Russo added to party SLOBODAN DESPOT(pty:dft). (Russo, Elizabeth)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SLOBODAN DESPOT. (jao)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate Arbitration Award. Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 113C-11807489, filed by CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Wylie, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. v. DESPOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Hurst Wylie
Represented By: David James Horr
Represented By: Juan Carlos Perez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLOBODAN DESPOT
Represented By: Elizabeth Koebel Russo
Represented By: Paulo R. Lima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?