Rausnitz v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gerald Rausnitz
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv22894
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (as modified) as per #22 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 9/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (EGT)
September 4, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order of Confidentiality by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Stipulated Protective Order)(Kramer, Peter)
August 23, 2019 Filing 21 Initial Disclosure(s) of Initial Disclosure 26 a by Gerald Rausnitz (Franken, Charles)
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by Gerald Rausnitz. (Franken, Charles)
August 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per order DE#18 . Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.. (drz)
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Kramer, Peter)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 8/03/2020 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 7/28/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..) and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 4/15/2020.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Modified on 8/20/2019 (drz).
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Kramer, Peter)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by Gerald Rausnitz. (Franken, Charles)
August 5, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 15 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (520428)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #12 the Defendant's motion to file its reply under seal. The Defendant is directed to file, under seal, an unredacted version of its reply along with any accompanying exhibits. The Clerk is directed to maintain this filing under seal until 8/2/2024 at which time the Clerk is directed to destroy the sealed filing. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kramer, Peter)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal Reply in support of Motion to Dismiss per Local Rule 5.4 by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Kramer, Peter)
July 31, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 11 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (520428)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #5 the Defendant's motion to file documents under seal. The Defendant is directed to file, under seal, an unredacted version of its motion to dismiss along with its accompanying exhibits. The Clerk is directed to maintain this filing under seal until 7/31/2024 at which time the Clerk is directed to destroy the sealed filing. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 7/31/2019. (kbe)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Gerald Rausnitz. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Franken, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/2/2019 (Kramer, Peter)
July 19, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 6 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (520428)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Defendant's Motion to File Under Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Kramer, Peter)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AEGON N.V. for Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Kramer, Peter)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Notice of Removal) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11807987, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Kramer, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rausnitz v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter M. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Rausnitz
Represented By: Charles David Franken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?