Longhini v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Doug Longhini
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22896
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the notice #11 indicating that the Parties have reached a settlement in this matter. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that on or before September 20, 2019, the Parties shall file a joint stipulation to dismiss. If the Parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction, they are advised that they must submit the settlement agreement for review and any stipulation must comply with the Eleventh Circuit's holding in Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272 (11th Cir. 2012). Otherwise, the dismissal of this matter is effective upon the filing of the Parties' joint stipulation of dismissal. Id. This case is CLOSED for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/30/2019. (sgi)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement by Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
August 26, 2019 Reset Answer Due Deadline: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. response due 9/2/2019. (ls)(per DE #10)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File, for good cause shown in the unopposed Motion. Response/Answer now due September 2, 2019. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/26/2019. (abu)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fine, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Complaint, for good cause shown in the unopposed motion:Defendant's Response/Answer now due 8/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/6/2019. (EGT)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Attorney Robert Stewart Fine added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fine, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, Verified Certificate of Plaintiff's Counsel Regarding Prior Filings Under the Americans with Disabilities Act by Anthony Joseph Perez on behalf of Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND OF COURT PRACTICE IN ADA CASES, referring case to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Doug Longhini. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Perez, Anthony)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (pcs)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11808691, filed by Doug Longhini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longhini v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Stewart Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Longhini
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?