Zeno v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Marisol Zeno
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Comapany and Frank J. Allocca
Case Number: 1:2019cv22898
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Frank Allocca; Mediation Hearing set for 12/6/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Frank J. Allocca. Mediation Hearing set for 12/6/2019 at 10:00 a.m.. (Chaplin, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 Clerks Notice to Filer re #20 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (vmz)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that by 8/15/2019 the parties shall submit a proposed order scheduling mediation in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Frank J. Allocca. (Saldamando, Gregory)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT by Lexington Insurance Comapany (Sims, Melissa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Marisol Zeno (Saldamando, Gregory)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Trial set for 5/11/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 5/5/2020 at 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 1/21/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that Plaintiff, Marisol Zeno, shall comply with the July 15, 2019 Order requiring the parties to file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements [ECF No. 10] by July 25, 2019, failing which the case will be dismissed without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Defendant, Lexington Insurance Company, shall comply with the Order requiring Defendant to file a removal status report [ECF No. 9] by July 25, 2019, failing which the case will be remanded as a sanction for non-compliance. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (vmz)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Comapany identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for Lexington Insurance Comapany (Sims, Melissa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Lexington Insurance Comapany (Sims, Melissa)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 7/22/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Removal Status Report due by 7/22/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Comapany re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Notice of Filing Exhibits to Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1-State Court Civil Cover Sheet and State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exh 2-Notice of Service of Process, #3 Exhibit Exh 3-Miami-Dade County Office of the Property Appraiser Detailed Report, #4 Exhibit Exh 4-Declaration in Support of Removal, #5 Exhibit Exh 5-Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, #6 Exhibit Exh 6-Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant, #7 Exhibit Exh 7-Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit Exh 8-Correspondence Served with Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exh 9-Civil Action Summons, #10 Exhibit Exh 10-Agreed Order on Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #11 Exhibit Exh 11-Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #12 Exhibit Exh 12-Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, #13 Exhibit Exh 13- Defendant's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #14 Exhibit Exh 14-Agreed Order on Defendant's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #15 Exhibit Exh 15-Defendant's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, #16 Exhibit Exh 16-Notice of Change of Address, #17 Exhibit Exh 17-Defendant's Third Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #18 Exhibit Exh 18-Agreed Order on Defendant's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, #19 Exhibit Exh 19-Agreed Order on Defendant's Third Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #20 Exhibit Exh 20-Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #21 Exhibit Exh 21-Defendant's Notice of Serving Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #22 Exhibit Exh 22-Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production, #23 Exhibit Exh 23-Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, #24 Exhibit Exh 24-Defendant's Notice of Serving First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, #25 Exhibit Exh 25-Defendant's First Request for Production to Plaintiff, #26 Exhibit Exh 26-Defendant's Amended Response to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, #27 Exhibit Exh 27-Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Answers to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, #28 Exhibit Exh 28-Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Request for Production to Plaintiff, #29 Exhibit Exh 29-Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Jurat Page) (Sims, Melissa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing by Lexington Insurance Comapany re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Civil Cover Sheet (Sims, Melissa) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (vmz).
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (vmz)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Records not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (vmz)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (vmz)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11808855, filed by Lexington Insurance Comapany.(Sims, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeno v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Zeno
Represented By: Gregory Saldamando
Represented By: Jennifer Scarlet Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Comapany
Represented By: Melissa M. Sims
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Genden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J. Allocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?