Ferguson v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Patrick W. Ferguson
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv22901
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America. (Cronin, Sean)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Jonathan Hafetz. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (mms)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jonathan Hafetz. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11905052 by Patrick W. Ferguson. Responses due by 8/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jonathan Hafetz, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shelowitz, Paul)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Renewed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Patrick N. Petrocelli. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 7/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (mms)
July 22, 2019 Attorney Patrick N. Petrocelli representing Ferguson, Patrick W. (Plaintiff) Activated. (pt)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Patrick N. Petrocelli. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Patrick W. Ferguson. Responses due by 8/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Patrick Petrocelli, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shelowitz, Paul)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Steven Watt. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 7/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (mms)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice to renew #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Patrick N. Petrocelli. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Patrick Petrocelli. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 7/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (mms)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven M. Watt. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11826340 by Patrick W. Ferguson. Responses due by 8/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Steven M. Watt, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shelowitz, Paul)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Patrick N. Petrocelli. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11822063 by Patrick W. Ferguson. Responses due by 7/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Patrick Petrocelli, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelowitz, Paul)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Paul Cronin on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Sean Paul Cronin added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Cronin, Sean)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE setting briefing schedule regarding habeas petition. (Show Cause Response due by 9/3/2019.)(Miscellaneous Deadline 7/29/2019.) Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 7/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (mms)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERENCE. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John J. OSullivan to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate or Set Aside Conviction and Incorporated Memorandum of Facts and Law in Support (D.E. 1) and any motions for an extension of time associated therewith. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (amb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. (amb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate Sentence (2255) . NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 17-CR-20877 (UU)), filed by Patrick W. Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Paul A. Shelowitz in Support of Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate or Set Aside Conviction, #3 Exhibit 1 - Criminal Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Information, #5 Exhibit 3 - Plea Agreement, #6 Exhibit 4 - Factual Proffer, #7 Exhibit 5 - Judgment, #8 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Appeal, #9 Exhibit 7 - Order Dismissing Appeal, #10 Exhibit 8 - Plea Transcript, #11 Exhibit 9 - Bureau of Prisons Record)(Shelowitz, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Sean Paul Cronin
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick W. Ferguson
Represented By: Steven M. Watt
Represented By: Jonathan Hafetz
Represented By: Patrick N. Petrocelli
Represented By: Paul Alan Shelowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?