Rapar, LLC v. Mansfield
Plaintiff: Rapar, LLC
Defendant: Stephen mansfield
Case Number: 1:2019cv22903
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Calendar Call set for 7/14/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Stephen Mansfield. (Berger, Evan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Rapar, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adar, Yaniv)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Rapar, LLC Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit) (Migdal, Joshua)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Stephen Mansfield of Filing Index of Docket Entries from the Underlying State Court Proceeding (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Berger, Evan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Concerning Removal by Stephen Mansfield (Berger, Evan)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Complaint, for good cause shown in the unopposed motion:Defendant's Response/Answer now due 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/23/2019. (EGT)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Stephen Mansfield. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Evan)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Rapar, LLC v. Stephen Mansfield) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11809146, filed by Stephen Mansfield. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer attached. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Berger, Evan) Modified on 7/15/2019 (ebz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rapar, LLC v. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen mansfield
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rapar, LLC
Represented By: Yaniv Adar
Represented By: Joshua Adam Migdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?