Queens Hospitality Corp. v. Breakfast Bitch LLC
Plaintiff: Queens Hospitality, LLC and Queens Hospitality Corp.
Defendant: Breakfast Bitch LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv22908
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Breakfast Bitch LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Pretrial Deadlines, Pretrial Conference and Trial Date)(Moreno Kostencki, Euyelit)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER Reopening case in light of #18 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/6/2019. (chd)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Breakfast Bitch LLC filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Queens Hospitality, LLC.(Schamy, Brenda)
August 29, 2019 ***Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated. (lk)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw Document #1 Complaint (Motion for Preliminary Injunction) by Queens Hospitality, LLC. Responses due by 9/11/2019 (Schamy, Brenda)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Ben T. Lila. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/19/2019. (km03)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ben T. Lila, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11903312 by Breakfast Bitch LLC. Attorney Matthew Scott Nelles added to party Breakfast Bitch LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Ben T. Lila, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelles, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to #12 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint (Motion for Preliminary Injunction) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion for Preliminary Injunction) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint (Motion for Preliminary Injunction) DECLARATION OF TRACII HUTSONA IN SUPPORT OF [DE 12] MOTION TO DISMISS AND MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Breakfast Bitch LLC (Moreno Kostencki, Euyelit)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint (Motion for Preliminary Injunction) ( Responses due by 8/28/2019), MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion for Preliminary Injunction), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint (Motion for Preliminary Injunction) ( Responses due by 8/28/2019) by Breakfast Bitch LLC. Attorney Euyelit Adriana Moreno Kostencki added to party Breakfast Bitch LLC(pty:dft). (Moreno Kostencki, Euyelit)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Queens Hospitality, LLC.Breakfast Bitch LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019 (Schamy, Brenda) Modified text duplicate entry on 7/30/2019 (vmz).
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Queens Hospitality, LLC. Breakfast Bitch LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Schamy, Brenda)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Anthony DiSchino on behalf of Queens Hospitality, LLC. Attorney Christopher Anthony DiSchino added to party Queens Hospitality, LLC (pty:pla). (DiSchino, Christopher)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to Breakfast Bitch LLC. (vmz)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Queens Hospitality, LLC re #1 Complaint filed by Queens Hospitality, LLC (Schamy, Brenda)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (vmz)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Breakfast Bitch LLC. (vmz)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Motion for Preliminary Injunction) against Breakfast Bitch LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11809569, filed by Queens Hospitality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Schamy, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Queens Hospitality Corp. v. Breakfast Bitch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queens Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Brenda Juliet Schamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queens Hospitality Corp.
Represented By: Brenda Juliet Schamy
Represented By: Christopher Anthony DiSchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breakfast Bitch LLC
Represented By: Euyelit Adriana Moreno Kostencki
Represented By: Matthew Scott Nelles
Represented By: Ben T. Lila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?