Rempesent v. CARNIVAL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: Renardo Rempesent
Defendant: CARNIVAL CORPORATION d/b/a CARNIVAL CRUISE LINE and Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv22924
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #15 Notice of Withdrawal of #11 Motion to Strike, filed by Renardo Rempesent. Denying as moot #11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint (Defendant's Fourth Affirmative Defense). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified text on 9/10/2019 (asl).
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Renardo Rempesent re #11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint (Defendant's Fourth Affirmative Defense) filed by Renardo Rempesent (As Moot) (Hayashi, Matthias)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Carnival Corporation Notice of Withdrawal of Fourth Affirmative Defense (Magee, John)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL : Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2019. Discovery due by 2/7/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 10/4/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2020. Motions due by 2/28/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/13/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 4/22/2020 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2020 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint (Defendant's Fourth Affirmative Defense) by Renardo Rempesent. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (Hayashi, Matthias)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Renardo Rempesent (Hayashi, Matthias)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Carnival Corporation (Magee, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. Attorney John Michael Magee added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Magee, John)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/16/2019 Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified on 7/24/2019 (drz).
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Renardo Rempesent. Carnival Corporation served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Hayashi, Matthias)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (drz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11814391, filed by Renardo Rempesent. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Aronfeld, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rempesent v. CARNIVAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renardo Rempesent
Represented By: Spencer Marc Aronfeld
Represented By: Matthias Masayasu Hayashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARNIVAL CORPORATION d/b/a CARNIVAL CRUISE LINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: John Michael Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?