City of South Miami et al v. Desantis et al
Plaintiff: The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc., City of South Miami, Hope Community Center, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., QLatinx, WeCount!, Inc., Family Action Network Movement, Inc. and Philip K. Stoddard
Defendant: Ron Desantis and Ashley Moody
Case Number: 1:2019cv22927
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE by United States of America Requesting Leave to Participate in Oral Argument (Ramkumar, Archith)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion, ECF No. #55 . The Hearing on Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #47 , is rescheduled for September 26, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. in the Miami Division, 400 N. Miami Ave, Courtroom 10-2, Miami, Florida 33128, before Judge Beth Bloom. Three hours have been set aside for this hearing. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ks01)
September 9, 2019 Filing 55 Unopposed EXPEDITED MOTION For Consideration of Plaintiffs Amended Motion For Preliminary Injunction (DE 47) Before October 1, 2019 re #47 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION. Scheduling Mediation before John W. Salmon. Mediation Hearing set for 12/5/2019 10:00 AM. Mediation Report sue on December 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 6, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, Philip K. Stoddard, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc., John Salmon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
September 4, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION TO DISMISS #38 Amended Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #38 Amended Complaint,, ( Responses due by 9/18/2019) by Ron Desantis, Ashley Moody. (Percival, James)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion, ECF No. #47 , Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division, 400 N. Miami Ave, Courtroom 10-2, Miami, Florida 33128, before Judge Beth Bloom. Three hours have been set aside for this hearing. However, the parties should notify the Court if they require more time. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom. (ks01)
September 4, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE to #23 Statement of Interest by US Government by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, Philip K. Stoddard, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.. (Sharpless, Rebecca)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction at ECF No. #47 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
August 30, 2019 Filing 48 STIPULATION re #47 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing (JOINT STIPULATION) by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, Philip K. Stoddard, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc. (Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
August 30, 2019 Filing 47 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, Philip K. Stoddard, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.. (Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
August 29, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing , Defendants' Surreply, filed by Ron Desantis, Ashley Moody. Replies due by 9/5/2019. (Percival, James)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/3/2019.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Defendants must separately re-file the pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
August 28, 2019 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Ron Desantis, Ashley Moody. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Defendants' Surreply)(Percival, James)
August 28, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Colleen Maher Ernst on behalf of Ron Desantis. Attorney Colleen Maher Ernst added to party Ron Desantis(pty:dft). (Ernst, Colleen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 41 Summons Issued as to Ron Desantis, Ashley Moody. (pes)
August 21, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, Philip K. Stoddard, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc. re #38 Amended Complaint,, of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Written Consent of Counsel for Defendants) (Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
August 21, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.. (Sharpless, Rebecca)
August 21, 2019 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pr. 15(a)(2) with the written consent of Defendants against All Defendants, filed by WeCount!, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc., QLatinx, Philip K. Stoddard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s))(Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 8/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (aw)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2019., Discovery due by 2/25/2020., Expert Discovery due by 2/25/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2019., Mediation Deadline 3/10/2020., In Limine Motions due by 3/18/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2020., All Pre-trial Motions due by 3/18/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/8/2020., Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 6/16/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 16, 2019 Filing 35 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., United States of America, WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Mesa, Victoria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 34 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by City of South Miami (Mesa, Victoria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 33 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc. (Mesa, Victoria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 32 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by QLatinx (Mesa, Victoria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 31 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Hope Community Center, Inc. (Mesa, Victoria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 30 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc. (Mesa, Victoria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 29 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. (Mesa, Victoria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 28 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by WeCount!, Inc. (Mesa, Victoria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 27 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc. (Mesa, Victoria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Family Action Network Movement, Inc. (Mesa, Victoria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victoria Mesa on behalf of Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.. Attorney Victoria Mesa added to party Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Victoria Mesa added to party City of South Miami(pty:pla), Attorney Victoria Mesa added to party Family Action Network Movement, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Victoria Mesa added to party Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Victoria Mesa added to party Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Victoria Mesa added to party Hope Community Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Victoria Mesa added to party QLatinx(pty:pla), Attorney Victoria Mesa added to party The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Victoria Mesa added to party WeCount!, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Victoria Mesa added to party Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.(pty:pla). (Mesa, Victoria)
August 16, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Compliance , filing of Certificate of Interested Persons, by Ron Desantis, Ashley Moody re #9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report (Percival, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 Statement of: Interest of the United States of America by United States of America (Ramkumar, Archith)
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Archith Ramkumar on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Archith Ramkumar added to party United States of America(pty:ip). (Ramkumar, Archith)
August 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing. per DE 21 Replies due by 8/21/2019. (cbr)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs shall file their Reply by August 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/13/2019. (mpn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sharpless, Rebecca)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing filed by Ron Desantis, Ashley Moody. Replies due by 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Sheriff Gualtieri, with attachments, #2 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Todd Price, with attachments)(Percival, James)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by August 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/9/2019. (mpn)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Ron Desantis, Ashley Moody. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Percival, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint,, on Defendant Governor Ron DeSantis filed by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.. (Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint,, on Defendant Attorney General Ashley Moody filed by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.. (Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barbara Jean Throne on behalf of Ashley Moody. Attorney Barbara Jean Throne added to party Ashley Moody(pty:dft). (Throne, Barbara)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Percival on behalf of Ron Desantis. Attorney James Percival added to party Ron Desantis(pty:dft). (Percival, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Mark Wenger on behalf of Ashley Moody. Attorney Edward Mark Wenger added to party Ashley Moody(pty:dft). (Wenger, Edward)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson. For Michelle P. Gonzalez Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11829220 by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.. Responses due by 8/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michelle P. Gonzalez, #2 Supplement)(Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Paul R. Chavez. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson. For Paul R. Chavez Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11822977 by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul R. Chavez, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Paul R. Chavez and Mich Gonzalez, mailing date July 16, 2019, (pt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Sharpless, Rebecca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., QLatinx, The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., WeCount!, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc. (Sharpless, Rebecca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ron Desantis, Ashley Moody. (mee)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11815727, filed by WeCount!, Inc., Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., Hope Community Center, Inc., Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc., The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc., City of South Miami, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc., QLatinx. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7)(Hernandez Anderson, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of South Miami et al v. Desantis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Guatemalan-Maya Center, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Sharpless
Represented By: Alana J Greer
Represented By: Oscar Hernan Londono
Represented By: Mich Gonzalez
Represented By: Michelle P. Gonzalez
Represented By: Victoria Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Sharpless
Represented By: Alana J Greer
Represented By: Oscar Hernan Londono
Represented By: Mich Gonzalez
Represented By: Michelle P. Gonzalez
Represented By: Victoria Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westminster Presbyterian Church United of Gainesville, Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Sharpless
Represented By: Alana J Greer
Represented By: Oscar Hernan Londono
Represented By: Mich Gonzalez
Represented By: Michelle P. Gonzalez
Represented By: Victoria Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of South Miami
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Sharpless
Represented By: Alana J Greer
Represented By: Oscar Hernan Londono
Represented By: Mich Gonzalez
Represented By: Michelle P. Gonzalez
Represented By: Victoria Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Community Center, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Sharpless
Represented By: Alana J Greer
Represented By: Oscar Hernan Londono
Represented By: Mich Gonzalez
Represented By: Michelle P. Gonzalez
Represented By: Victoria Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Sharpless
Represented By: Alana J Greer
Represented By: Oscar Hernan Londono
Represented By: Mich Gonzalez
Represented By: Michelle P. Gonzalez
Represented By: Victoria Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Immigrant Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Sharpless
Represented By: Alana J Greer
Represented By: Oscar Hernan Londono
Represented By: Mich Gonzalez
Represented By: Michelle P. Gonzalez
Represented By: Victoria Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QLatinx
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Sharpless
Represented By: Alana J Greer
Represented By: Oscar Hernan Londono
Represented By: Mich Gonzalez
Represented By: Michelle P. Gonzalez
Represented By: Victoria Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WeCount!, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Sharpless
Represented By: Alana J Greer
Represented By: Oscar Hernan Londono
Represented By: Mich Gonzalez
Represented By: Michelle P. Gonzalez
Represented By: Victoria Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Action Network Movement, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Paul R. Chavez
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Sharpless
Represented By: Alana J Greer
Represented By: Oscar Hernan Londono
Represented By: Mich Gonzalez
Represented By: Michelle P. Gonzalez
Represented By: Victoria Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip K. Stoddard
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Sharpless
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Desantis
Represented By: James Percival
Represented By: Colleen Maher Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Moody
Represented By: James Percival
Represented By: Edward Mark Wenger
Represented By: Barbara Jean Throne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?