Pace v. Lawerance et al
Plaintiff: Marvin Pace
Defendant: E. Cobarco, B. Martin, Omar Kaersenthout, Herman Lewis, D. Duke, Jaha, L. Wilson, A. Lawerance, G. Barnes, Lieutenant M.P., Jane Doe, Sergeant Herman O Lewis, Sergeant Daniel A. Duke, Martin P. Byron and Corporal Gerald A. Barnes
Case Number: 1:2019cv22928
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against G. Barnes, D. Duke, Omar Kaersenthout, A. Lawerance, Herman Lewis, L. Wilson, Lieutenant M.P., Martin P. Byron, Jane Doe filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Marvin Pace.(pcs)
August 27, 2019 Amended Complaint due by 9/2/2019 Per DE 12 . (vmz)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. The Amended Complaint is due no later than September 2, 2019. Failure to adhere to court deadlines will result in a recommendation for dismissal either for want of prosecution or for failure to comply with court orders. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (bca)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint re #8 Order by Marvin Pace. Responses due by 9/4/2019 (jao)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Marvin Pace (address previously updated) (ail)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Mailing Address Change by Marvin Pace (System Updated) (vmz)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO AMEND 42 U.S.C. 1983 on or before August 29, 2019, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, signed under the penalty of perjury, providing a short and plain statement of a claim for relief, a basis for federal jurisdiction, and a demand for judgment. ( Amended Complaint due by 8/29/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form) (fbn)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (bca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The number of days to respond to the Summons(es) is incorrect (jao)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/Declaration in Support re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marvin Pace. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(jao)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marvin Pace. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(jao)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jao)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against G. Barnes, E. Cobarco, D. Duke, Jaha, Omar Kaersenthout, A. Lawerance, Herman Lewis, B. Martin, L. Wilson. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Marvin Pace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summon(s))(jao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pace v. Lawerance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Cobarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Kaersenthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Lawerance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant M.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Herman O Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Daniel A. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin P. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Gerald A. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?