Jimenez v. Corporal Fertilien
Plaintiff: Johel Jimenez
Defendant: Corporal Fertilien
Case Number: 1:2019cv22930
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO AMEND 42 U.S.C. 1983 on or before August 19, 2019, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, signed under the penalty of perjury, providing a short and plain statement of a claim for relief, a basis for federal jurisdiction, and a demand for judgment. (Amended Complaint due by 8/19/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form) (fbn)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (bca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johel Jimenez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ebz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ebz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Corporal Fertilien. Filing fee $ 400.00, Not Paid. IFP Filed, filed by Johel Jimenez.(ebz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Corporal Fertilien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Fertilien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johel Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?