Diaz del Cid v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan, Lee Francis Cissna, Adam Opaciuch, William Pelham Barr, Octavio Caro, James McHenry, Yaniece McPherson and Varsenik Papazian
Case Number: 1:2019cv22933
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (mmc)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #3 Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency; denying as moot #18 Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid. Responses due by 8/19/2019 (Garcia, Kenia)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid. Varsenik Papazian served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Garcia, Kenia)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid. Yaniece McPherson served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Garcia, Kenia)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid. Octavio Caro served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Garcia, Kenia)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included filed by Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid. (Garcia, Kenia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid. James McHenry served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Garcia, Kenia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid. Kevin K McAleenan served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Garcia, Kenia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid. Lee Francis Cissna served on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Garcia, Kenia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid. William Pelham Barr served on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Garcia, Kenia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by William Pelham Barr, Octavio Caro, Lee Francis Cissna, Kevin K McAleenan, James McHenry, Yaniece McPherson, Adam Opaciuch, Varsenik Papazian To Court Regarding Schedule for Petitioner's Removal (Lee, Dexter)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included filed by William Pelham Barr, Octavio Caro, Lee Francis Cissna, Kevin K McAleenan, James McHenry, Yaniece McPherson, Adam Opaciuch, Varsenik Papazian. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Record of Deportable/Inadmissible Alien (Form I-213))(Lee, Dexter)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dexter Lee on behalf of William Pelham Barr, Octavio Caro, Lee Francis Cissna, Kevin K McAleenan, James McHenry, Yaniece McPherson, Adam Opaciuch, Varsenik Papazian. Attorney Dexter Lee added to party William Pelham Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Dexter Lee added to party Octavio Caro(pty:dft), Attorney Dexter Lee added to party Lee Francis Cissna(pty:dft), Attorney Dexter Lee added to party Kevin K McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Dexter Lee added to party James McHenry(pty:dft), Attorney Dexter Lee added to party Yaniece McPherson(pty:dft), Attorney Dexter Lee added to party Adam Opaciuch(pty:dft), Attorney Dexter Lee added to party Varsenik Papazian(pty:dft). (Lee, Dexter)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Attorney Appearance re Noticing INS attorney by Noticing INS Attorney on behalf of William Pelham Barr, Octavio Caro, Lee Francis Cissna, Kevin K McAleenan, James McHenry, Yaniece McPherson, Adam Opaciuch, Varsenik Papazian. Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party William Pelham Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party Octavio Caro(pty:dft), Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party Lee Francis Cissna(pty:dft), Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party Kevin K McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party James McHenry(pty:dft), Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party Yaniece McPherson(pty:dft), Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party Adam Opaciuch(pty:dft), Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party Varsenik Papazian(pty:dft). (jua)
July 18, 2019 Set Deadlines Per DE#5. Responses due by 7/29/2019 Replies due by 8/2/2019. (cqs)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR EMERGENCY STAY OF REMOVAL. Response due July 29, 2019 at noon. Reply due August 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Pelham Barr, U.S. Attorney General, Octavio Caro, Lee Francis Cissna, Kevin K McAleenan, James McHenry, Yaniece McPherson, Adam Opaciuch, Varsenik Papazian.(ebz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included by Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (Garcia, Kenia)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. (ebz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 113C-11816386, filed by Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Appendix)(Garcia, Kenia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz del Cid v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Stuar Diaz del Cid
Represented By: Kenia Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Opaciuch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pelham Barr
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octavio Caro
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McHenry
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaniece McPherson
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsenik Papazian
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?