Ice v. Carnival Corporation
Plaintiff: Keith Ice
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv22942
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 9/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (aw)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Laura Bonn. Mediation Hearing set for 01/29/2020 at 10:30 am. (Niad Hannah, Cindy)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Laura Bonn. Mediation Deadline 2/3/2020. Mediation Hearing set for 1/29/2020 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Bonn Laura. Mediation Hearing set for 1/29/20 at 10:30 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winkleman, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2019., Discovery due by 5/19/2020., Expert Discovery due by 5/19/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 10/18/2019., Mediation Deadline 6/2/2020., In Limine Motions due by 6/10/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 6/10/2020., All Pre-trial Motions due by 6/10/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/31/2020., Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 9/8/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Keith Ice (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B)(Winkleman, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. (Webb, Donnise)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donnise DeSouza Webb on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Donnise DeSouza Webb added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Webb, Donnise)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Keith Ice. Carnival Corporation served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Winkleman, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (amb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Carnival Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11818496, filed by Keith Ice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Winkleman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ice v. Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Donnise DeSouza Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Ice
Represented By: Michael A. Winkleman
Represented By: Marc E Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?