Zablotny v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc
Plaintiff: Victoria Zablotny
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv22965
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams., Calendar Call set for 12/1/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams.), ( Mediation Deadline 6/1/2020.) Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Victoria Zablotny (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Munch, Jacob)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc (Applin, Nicholas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Victoria Zablotny (Saylor, Catherine)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Victoria Zablotny (Saylor, Catherine)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. Attorney Nicholas Allen Applin added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc(pty:dft). (Applin, Nicholas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc, filed by Victoria Zablotny.(Munch, Jacob)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES; Referred to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 07/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (jao)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11822369, filed by Victoria Zablotny. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Munch, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zablotny v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Zablotny
Represented By: Jacob John Munch
Represented By: Catherine Munch Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc
Represented By: Nicholas Allen Applin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?