Simmons v. Carnival Corporation
Plaintiff: Julie Simmons
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv23000
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ( Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 6/16/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga). Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Julie Simmons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hernandez, Eduardo)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Julie Simmons (Hernandez, Eduardo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Carnival Corporation (Magee, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. Attorney John Michael Magee added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Magee, John)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Julie Simmons. Carnival Corporation served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Hernandez, Eduardo)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ar2)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (ar2) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/19/2019) (ar2).
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11828760, filed by Julie Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hernandez, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Simmons
Represented By: Eduardo Jesus Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: John Michael Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?