Humana, Inc. v. St. Jude Medical, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Humana, Inc.
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories and St. Jude Medical, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv23119
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 31 Renewed MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling On Their Motion to Dismiss And Memorandum in Support by Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, LLC. Responses due by 10/8/2019 (Shapiro, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2019 Filing 30 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, LLC. Responses due by 10/8/2019 (Shapiro, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying without prejudice #28 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
September 17, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Due Dates for Motion to Dismiss Briefing by Humana, Inc.. Responses due by 10/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Juan)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #25 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RESETTING PLANNING & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2019 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling On Their Motion to Dismiss And Memorandum in Support by Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, LLC. Responses due by 9/26/2019 (Shapiro, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting In Part #23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may file an opening memorandum not to exceed 25 pages, and Plaintiffs opposing memorandum of law may not exceed 25 pages. Defendants reply shall not exceed 12 pages. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 9, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Shapiro, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Humana, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Service List)(Rodriguez, Juan)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Andrew A Kassof. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) James R P Hileman. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Daniel I Siegfried. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
September 5, 2019 Filing 18 Initial Disclosure(s) of Defendants' Objections to Initial Disclosures by Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, LLC (Shapiro, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel I. Siegfried. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11952116 by Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, LLC. Responses due by 9/17/2019 (Shapiro, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Andrew A. Kassof. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11952099 by Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, LLC. Responses due by 9/17/2019 (Shapiro, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James R.P. Hileman. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11952081 by Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, LLC. Responses due by 9/17/2019 (Shapiro, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, LLC (Shapiro, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Humana, Inc.. Abbott Laboratories waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019; St. Jude Medical, LLC waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Bowers, Amy)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 9/6/2019, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Scott C. Solberg. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) James W. Joseph. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Benjamin E. Waldin. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Scott C. Solberg. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11863733 by Humana, Inc.. Responses due by 8/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Juan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James W. Joseph. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11863691 by Humana, Inc.. Responses due by 8/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Juan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Benjamin E. Waldin. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11863629 by Humana, Inc.. Responses due by 8/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Juan)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Humana, Inc. (Rodriguez, Juan)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical, LLC. (lbc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Humana, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Rodriguez, Juan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11850093, filed by Humana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humana, Inc. v. St. Jude Medical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humana, Inc.
Represented By: Juan Jose Rodriguez
Represented By: Amy Michelle Bowers
Represented By: Scott C. Solberg
Represented By: James W. Joseph
Represented By: Benjamin E. Waldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: James R.P. Hileman
Represented By: Andrew A. assof
Represented By: Daniel I. Siegfried
Represented By: Jeffrey Brian Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, LLC
Represented By: James R.P. Hileman
Represented By: Andrew A. assof
Represented By: Daniel I. Siegfried
Represented By: Jeffrey Brian Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?