GREEN v. FLA COMMISSION OF OFFENDER REVIEW et al
Plaintiff: FELTON BERNARD GREEN
Defendant: Cynthia Zimmerman, JAMES T BAKER, Andre Thornton, FULLERTON JENKINS, Julie Jones, ALDO LOBOS, Donald Henry, FLA COMMISSION OF OFFENDER REVIEW, Denise McGill-Johnston and FLA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 1:2019cv23139
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - 28 U.S.C. 2254. On or before forty-five days from the date of this order the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (VACATED PER E#17)PAPERLESS ORDER vacating re #16 Order re recharacterization of habeas petition and requiring amended petition, in light of Petitioner's recent amended habeas petition pursuant to 28 USC 2254. It is evident Petitioner has authorized the court with proceeding with this filing as a 2254 petition, and as such, has filed the current amendment #15 . Therefore, no further Castro warnings are required, nor does the court require any further amendments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/11/2019. (nn)Text Modified on 9/11/2019 (cqs).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINAL ORDER TO PETITIONER RE RECHARACTERIZATION OF FILING AS A PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT 28 U.S.C. 2254 AND REQUIRING THE FILING OF A FINAL AMENDED PETITION on or before October 2, 2019. ( Amended Complaint due by 10/2/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 2254 Complaint Form) (fbn)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT 2254 against JAMES T BAKER, FLA COMMISSION OF OFFENDER REVIEW, FLA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, FULLERTON JENKINS, Donald Henry, Julie Jones, ALDO LOBOS, Denise McGill-Johnston, Andre Thornton, Cynthia Zimmerman, filed by FELTON BERNARD GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(cds)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #13 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Petitioner has not shown good cause to exceed page limitations or compliance with the federal and local rules governing the filing of his amended petition. Petitioner shall file his amended petition, on the proper form, in compliance with the rules governing such filings. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/5/2019. (nn)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by FELTON BERNARD GREEN. (cqs)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granted as this is a challenge to a violation of probation conviction filed as a federal habeas corpus petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 in which the $5.00 fee is waived for those prisoners who meet the pauper status. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/30/2019. (nn)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 Acknowledgement of Court Order, re #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FELTON BERNARD GREEN (cds)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis With Inmate Trust Account by FELTON BERNARD GREEN. (cds)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PETITIONER RE: RECHARACTERIZATION OF FILING TO BE CONSTRUED AS A PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT 28 U.S.C. 2254 on or before September 2, 2019., ( Amended Complaint due by 9/2/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 2254 Complaint Form) (fbn)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 9/2/2019. Motions due by 9/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jua)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from Florida Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00291. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING TRANSFER OF CASE. The magistrate judge's report and recommendation (ECF No. #3 ) is adopted and incorporated by reference in this order of the court. The clerk shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 7/29/19. (blb)
July 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed re: #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The deadline to file Objections to the R&R has expired. No Objections have been filed. (cle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO TRANSFER HABEAS CORPUS PETITION. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the case file, including any service copies and pending motions, be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division, for all further proceedings. - R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/27/19. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/25/2019. (blb)
June 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (blb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se. (blb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by FELTON BERNARD GREEN. (blb) *No copies, No fee*

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. FLA COMMISSION OF OFFENDER REVIEW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Zimmerman
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES T BAKER
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Thornton
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULLERTON JENKINS
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Jones
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALDO LOBOS
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Henry
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLA COMMISSION OF OFFENDER REVIEW
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise McGill-Johnston
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELTON BERNARD GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?