Sunteck Transport Company LLC v. Grand Slam Transport Services, INC.
Plaintiff: Sunteck Transport Company, LLC,
Defendant: Grand Slam Transport Services, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23209
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:0081
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Grand Slam Transport Services, INC.. (lbc)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Robert S. Crowder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/20/2019. (jzn)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Sunteck Transport Company, LLC, of Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Proposed Summons for Grand Slam Transport Services, Inc.) (Levy, Joshua)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert S. Crowder. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11917416 by Sunteck Transport Company, LLC,. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Levy, Joshua)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunteck Transport Company, LLC, identifying Other Affiliate Sunteck / TTS Integration LLC for Sunteck Transport Company, LLC, (Levy, Joshua)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint by Sunteck Transport Company, LLC against Grand Slam Transport Services, Inc. against Sunteck Transportation Company LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11867003, filed by Sunteck Transportation Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Levy, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunteck Transport Company LLC v. Grand Slam Transport Services, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Slam Transport Services, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunteck Transport Company, LLC,
Represented By: Joshua Asher Levy
Represented By: Robert S. Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?