Elite Premium Finance Inc. v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: Elite Premium Finance Inc.
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23217
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Elite Premium Finance Inc.. Responses due by 10/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Magolnick, Joel)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff must file a Response by September 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/9/2019. (chd)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Elite Premium Finance Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Magolnick, Joel)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Attorney David Andrew Greene added to party WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/10/2019 (Greene, David)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Elite Premium Finance Inc.. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Magolnick, Joel)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (cbr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Elite Premium Finance Inc. re #1 Complaint filed by Elite Premium Finance Inc. (Magolnick, Joel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Compliance Regarding Civil Cover Sheet by Elite Premium Finance Inc. re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Magolnick, Joel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (mee)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11868283, filed by Elite Premium Finance Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Magolnick, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Premium Finance Inc. v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: David Andrew Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Premium Finance Inc.
Represented By: Joel Steven Magolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?