Cargo Air, LTD v. MIAMI NDT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Cargo Air, LTD
Defendant: Turbine Engine Center, Inc., Odyssey Leasing, LLC, Odyssey Engines, LLC and MIAMI NDT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23280
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Cargo Air, LTD (Domark, Jason)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by MIAMI NDT, INC., Odyssey Engines, LLC, Odyssey Leasing, LLC, Turbine Engine Center, Inc.. (Berger, Evan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evan Benjamin Berger on behalf of MIAMI NDT, INC., Odyssey Engines, LLC, Odyssey Leasing, LLC, Turbine Engine Center, Inc.. Attorney Evan Benjamin Berger added to party MIAMI NDT, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Benjamin Berger added to party Odyssey Engines, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Benjamin Berger added to party Odyssey Leasing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Benjamin Berger added to party Turbine Engine Center, Inc.(pty:dft). (Berger, Evan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cargo Air, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Domark, Jason)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Entry of Default as to Miami NDT, Inc., Turbine Engine Center, Inc., Odyssey Engines, LLC., Odyssey Leasing, LLC. - Motions Terminated: #7 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/29/2019. (lk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Denied, Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#8]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Cargo Air, LTD. All Defendants. See image at DE #6 (lk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants by Cargo Air, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Domark, Jason)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Cargo Air, LTD re #3 Summons Issued of Filing Returns of Service (Domark, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Cargo Air, LTD by Cargo Air, LTD (Domark, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MIAMI NDT, INC., Odyssey Engines, LLC, Odyssey Leasing, LLC, Turbine Engine Center, Inc.. (kpe)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11877756, filed by Cargo Air LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Miami NDT, Inc., #3 Summon(s) Odyssey Engines, LLC, #4 Summon(s) Odyssey Leasing, LLC, #5 Summon(s) Turbine Engine Center, Inc., #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3)(Domark, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cargo Air, LTD v. MIAMI NDT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turbine Engine Center, Inc.
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odyssey Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odyssey Engines, LLC
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIAMI NDT, INC.
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cargo Air, LTD
Represented By: Charles Reid Kline
Represented By: Elizabeth Fata Carpenter
Represented By: Jason Ryan Domark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?