DOPAZO III et al v. Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jackeline Dopazo and ARTURO DOPAZO III
Defendant: Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv23307
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Administrative Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company (Seale, Nyasha)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/16/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Sceduling form)(Seale, Nyasha)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Geovera Holdings for Geovera Specialty Insurance Company (Robinson, Lucie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Removal by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company (Robinson, Lucie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. (Seale, Nyasha)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 8/20/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Arturo Dopazo III and Jackeline Dopazo v. Geovera Specialty Insurance Company) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11883871, filed by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. No motion to dismiss/no answer filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Geovera surplus line information, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Estimate, #4 Exhibit Property Deed, #5 Exhibit Homestead Exemption, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplement State Court Record)(Seale, Nyasha)Text Modified on 8/8/2019 (mee).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOPAZO III et al v. Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackeline Dopazo
Represented By: Daniel Diego Castro
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTURO DOPAZO III
Represented By: Daniel Diego Castro
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nyasha Simone Seale
Represented By: Lucie Ailene Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?