Schloser v. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office et al
Plaintiff: Michel Nessim Schloser
Defendant: Director Yeseira Diaz, Kevin McAleenan, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office, Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security and Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv23310
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michel Nessim Schloser. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordero, Luis)
October 1, 2019 Filing 28 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Michel Nessim Schloser (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordero, Luis)
October 1, 2019 Filing 27 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Michel Nessim Schloser (Cordero, Luis)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office (Feeley, Matthew)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying as moot #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants shall file a combined response or separate answers to the Amended Complaint within the time permitted by the Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 23, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH APA RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED filed by Michel Nessim Schloser. Replies due by 9/30/2019. (Cordero, Luis)
September 23, 2019 Filing 23 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michel Nessim Schloser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s))(Cordero, Luis)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 16, 2019 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH APA RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED by Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Masetta-Alvarez, Katelyn)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez on behalf of Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office. Attorney Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez added to party Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez added to party Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez added to party Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office(pty:dft). (Masetta-Alvarez, Katelyn)
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew James Feeley on behalf of Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office. Attorney Matthew James Feeley added to party Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew James Feeley added to party Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew James Feeley added to party Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office(pty:dft). (Feeley, Matthew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michel Nessim Schloser. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordero, Luis)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 10/1/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time permitted by the Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on Attorney General on 9/3/19- by Michel Nessim Schloser. All Defendants. (Cordero, Luis) Modified text on 9/6/2019 (lk).
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on U.S.Atty-Ariana Fajardo-8/27/19- by Michel Nessim Schloser. All Defendants. (Cordero, Luis) Modified text on 9/6/2019 (lk).
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Michel Nessim Schloser. Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Cordero, Luis)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Michel Nessim Schloser. Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security served on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Cordero, Luis)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Michel Nessim Schloser. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office served on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019., SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Michel Nessim Schloser. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office served on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Cordero, Luis)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 11/5/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General (lk)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) U.S. Attorney General by Michel Nessim Schloser re #1 Complaint, filed by Michel Nessim Schloser (Cordero, Luis)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michel Nessim Schloser. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordero, Luis)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Erica Rodriguez. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11885048 by Michel Nessim Schloser. Responses due by 8/22/2019 (Cordero, Luis)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office, U.S. Attorney. (ar2)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Review of Agency Action Under the Administrative Procedure Act against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11884239, filed by Michel Nessim Schloser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Cordero, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schloser v. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Yeseira Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami Field Office
Represented By: Matthew James Feeley
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Matthew James Feeley
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Matthew James Feeley
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Nessim Schloser
Represented By: Luis Alberto Cordero
Represented By: Erica Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?