Monterey at Malibu Bay Condominium Association, Inc. v. Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Monterey at Malibu Bay Condominium Association, Inc.
Defendant: Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv23353
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re #11 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Michael Patrick, Esq., and Hunter Patterson, Esq., added. Attorney Randall Mark Shochet terminated. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Monterey at Malibu Bay Condominium Association, Inc. NOTICE THAT ATTORNEYS CHARGING LIEN IS NOT RIPE (Shochet, Randall)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Monterey at Malibu Bay Condominium Association, Inc. re #11 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Michael Patrick, Hunter Patterson for Randall Shochet NOTICE OF CHARGING AND RETAINING LIEN. Attorney Randall Mark Shochet added to party Monterey at Malibu Bay Condominium Association, Inc.(pty:pla). (Shochet, Randall)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before John S. Freud. Mediation Deadline 3/9/2020. Mediation Hearing set for 3/5/2020 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Empire Indemnity Insurance Company, John S Freud. Mediation Hearing set for 3/5/2020 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chodos, Jason)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Michael Patrick, Hunter Patterson for Randall Shochet by Monterey at Malibu Bay Condominium Association, Inc.. Responses due by 10/1/2019 (Patterson, Hunter)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 9/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (aw)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2019., Discovery due by 6/2/2020., Expert Discovery due by 6/2/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 10/29/2019., Mediation Deadline 6/16/2020., In Limine Motions due by 6/24/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 6/24/2020., Motions due by 6/24/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/14/2020., Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 9/22/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Joint Proposed Case Management Schedule, #2 Exhibit "B" - Magistrate Judge Election Form, #3 Exhibit "C" - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Chodos, Jason)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Premier Claim Consultants, Inc. for Empire Indemnity Insurance Company (Chodos, Jason)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company. (Chodos, Jason)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company re #4 Order,, Set Answer Due Deadline,, Set/Reset Deadlines, Notice of Filing Circuit Court Docket (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (Kuczynski, Dana)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Michael Patrick and Jose R. Rodriguez, mailing date August 13, 2019, (cco)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Post-Removal Procedures, and Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties: Empire Indemnity Insurance Company response due 8/28/2019., ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/3/2019). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11893415, filed by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company. No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A" - Amended Complaint (State Court), #3 Exhibit "B" - Florida Dept. of State, Div. of Corporations Website, #4 Exhibit "C" - Oklahoma Secretary of State Website, #5 Exhibit "D" - FLOIR Website, #6 Exhibit "E" - Proof of Loss, #7 Exhibit "F" - Payment Documentation of Insurance Proceeds) (Chodos, Jason) Modified text on 8/12/2019 (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monterey at Malibu Bay Condominium Association, Inc. v. Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterey at Malibu Bay Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Hunter David Patterson
Represented By: Randall Mark Shochet
Represented By: Michael Patrick
Represented By: Jose R. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Michael Chodos
Represented By: Dana Beth Kuczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?