Gomez v. Beacon-FL LLC
Plaintiff: Andres Gomez
Defendant: Beacon-FL LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv23371
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Re: #1 Complaint filed by Andres Gomez. It is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint and Corporate Disclosure Statement on or before October 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/7/2019. (kou)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer and file Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beacon-FL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stauber, David)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint and Corporate Disclosure Statement on or before October 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/5/2019. (kou)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint and file Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beacon-FL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stauber, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Statement of: Claim Plaintiff, Andres Gomez' Statement of Claim and Response to Order of Court-Mandated Requirements in ADA-Based Cases by Andres Gomez re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, (Perez, Anthony)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David B Stauber on behalf of Beacon-FL LLC. Attorney David B Stauber added to party Beacon-FL LLC(pty:dft). (Stauber, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Andres Gomez. Beacon-FL LLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Perez, Anthony)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman per DE 4. (vjk)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 10/14/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Beacon-FL LLC. (amb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beacon-FL LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11895353, filed by Andres Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Beacon-FL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon-FL LLC
Represented By: David B Stauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Gomez
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?