Tinkler v. Mentor Worldwide, LLC
Plaintiff: Jennifer Tinkler
Defendant: MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC and Mentor Worldwide, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv23373
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RESETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Walz, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Jennifer Tinkler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Scheduling Order)(Seitz, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jennifer Tinkler. Replies due by 9/16/2019. (Eubanks, Cameron)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cameron Wayne Eubanks on behalf of Jennifer Tinkler. Attorney Cameron Wayne Eubanks added to party Jennifer Tinkler(pty:pla). (Eubanks, Cameron)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. Responses due by 9/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Walz, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy E. Furness on behalf of Mentor Worldwide, LLC. Attorney Amy E. Furness added to party Mentor Worldwide, LLC(pty:dft). (Furness, Amy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Tinkler. Mentor Worldwide, LLC waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Seitz, William)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 9/13/2019, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mentor Worldwide, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, Corporate Parent Ethicon, Inc. for Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Walz, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Striking #3 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mentor Worldwide, LLC by Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Walz, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re #3 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (jas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Walz, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11895723, filed by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. No Answer/Motion to Dismiss attached. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #4 Exhibit 2)(Walz, David) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tinkler v. Mentor Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Amy E. Furness
Represented By: Caycee Danielle Hampton
Represented By: David J. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Tinkler
Represented By: Curtis Jay Mase
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Levitt
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Eubanks
Represented By: William Robert Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?