Mora v. Carnival Corporation
Plaintiff: Octavio Mora
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv23396
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL and ORDER DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Octavio Mora (Hernandez, Eduardo)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Octavio Mora (Hernandez, Eduardo)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for two-week period 5/11/2020 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 5/5/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Carnival Corporation (Magee, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. Attorney John Michael Magee added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Magee, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Octavio Mora. Carnival Corporation served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Hernandez, Eduardo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (pcs)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11899676, filed by Octavio Mora. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hernandez, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mora v. Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Mora
Represented By: Eduardo Jesus Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: John Michael Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?