Bizav Aircraft Management, LLC v. Mnuchin, et al
Plaintiff: Bizav Aircraft Management, LLC
Defendant: Department of The Treasury, Director Andrea Gacki, Secretary Steven Mnuchin and Office of Foreign Assets Control
Case Number: 1:2019cv23441
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bizav Aircraft Management, LLC. Department of The Treasury served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Andrea Gacki served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Steven Mnuchin served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Office of Foreign Assets Control served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Wolland, Frank)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Within seven (7) days of perfecting service upon Defendants, Plaintiff shall file proof of such service with the Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying as moot #6 Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency; denying #7 Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Second EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction by Bizav Aircraft Management, LLC. Responses due by 9/23/2019 (Wolland, Frank)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 First EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included Motion for Emergency Hearing by Bizav Aircraft Management, LLC. Responses due by 9/23/2019 (Wolland, Frank)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrea Gacki, Steven Mnuchin, Ariana Fajardo Orshan, Attorney General of the United States, Office of Foreign Assets Control. (amb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (amb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus, Injunctive Relief, and Declaratory Relief (Claim of Unconstitutionality) against Andrea Gacki, Steven Mnuchin. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11908162, filed by Bizav Aircraft Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Summon(s), #21 Summon(s), #22 Summon(s), #23 Summon(s), #24 Summon(s))(Wolland, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bizav Aircraft Management, LLC v. Mnuchin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of The Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Andrea Gacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Steven Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Foreign Assets Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bizav Aircraft Management, LLC
Represented By: Frank Wolland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?