Villanueva v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Villanueva
Defendant: The Federal Bureau of Investigation and UNITED STATES Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2019cv23452
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to The Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. Reason: Responsive pleading (i.e. Motion for Extention of Time to File Answer to Complaint, Motion to Dismiss Complaint, etc) has been filed Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/8/2019. (kpe)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Complaint, for good cause shown in the unopposed motion:Defendants' Response/Answer now due 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 10/7/2019. (EGT)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion for Entry of Default upon the appearance and unopposed motion filed by Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 10/7/2019. (EGT)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by The Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party The Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party United States Department of Justice(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to The Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice by Daniel Villanueva. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order - clerk's default)(Visconti, Melissa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Daniel Villanueva of Filing Proof of Service on Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipts and delivery confirmations) (Visconti, Melissa)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Of Referral And Notice Of Court Practices And Procedures. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kpe)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11910664, filed by Daniel Villanueva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) United States Department of Justice, #3 Summon(s) United States Department of Justice c/o US Attorney's Office, #4 Summon(s) FBI, #5 Summon(s) FBI c/o US Attorney's Office)(Visconti, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villanueva v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES Department of Justice
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Villanueva
Represented By: Melissa Damian Visconti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?