United States of America v. One ASUS Laptop Computer S/N C2N0AS407004088
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ONE ASUS LAPTOP COMPUTER S/N C2N0AS407004088
Claimant: Gregory Chandler, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23486
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 49:0781
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 10/24/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Verified CLAIM and ANSWER re: Forfeiture in rem by Gregory Chandler, Jr. (ls)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant In Rem Issued as to ONE ASUS LAPTOP COMPUTER S/N C2N0AS407004088. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED against ONE ASUS LAPTOP COMPUTER S/N C2N0AS407004088. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Complaint Cover Sheet, #3 Warrant of Arrest In Rem)(Laserna, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One ASUS Laptop Computer S/N C2N0AS407004088
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE ASUS LAPTOP COMPUTER S/N C2N0AS407004088
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Peter Laserna
Represented By: Peter A. Laserna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gregory Chandler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?