Hindsman v. Carnival Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Amy Hindsman
Defendant: Carnival Corporation and John Doe Crewman
Case Number: 1:2019cv23536
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that by 10/23/2019 the parties shall submit a proposed order scheduling mediation. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Amended Complaint due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 21, 2019 Filing 30 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2019 re #21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM With Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Carnival Corporation. Total time in court: 20 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Robert John Hanreck, Cameron W. Eubanks, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (afa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM With Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Carnival Corporation. (Seitz, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM With Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Amy Hindsman. Replies due by 10/15/2019. (Hanreck, Robert)
October 3, 2019 Filing 27 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amy Hindsman (Hanreck, Robert)
October 2, 2019 Filing 26 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Carnival Corporation (Seitz, William)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that by 10/4/2019 the parties shall comply with the September 11, 2019 Order. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 8/11/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM With Incorporated Memorandum of Law : Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2019 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
September 26, 2019 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM With Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Carnival Corporation. Responses due by 10/10/2019 (Seitz, William)
September 26, 2019 Filing 20 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Carnival Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Seitz, William)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Carnival Corporation and Defendant John Doe Crewman have up through and including 9/27/2019 to file a combined response or separate answers to Plaintiff's Complaint. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Amy Hindsman. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Robert Seitz on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney William Robert Seitz added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Seitz, William)
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Carnival Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order on motion for extension of time to respond to complaint)(Mase, Curtis)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Curtis Jay Mase on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Curtis Jay Mase added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Mase, Curtis)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Cory Finkel on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Adam Cory Finkel added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Finkel, Adam)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Amy Hindsman. John Doe Crewman served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Hanreck, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Amy Hindsman. Carnival Corporation served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Hanreck, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Striking #8 Certificate of Service filed by Amy Hindsman by Amy Hindsman (Hanreck, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that after Defendant John Doe Crewman. has been served, Defendant Carnival Corporation and Defendant John Doe Crewman shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must file a Notice of Striking, then refile the document using the event Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed.. (ls)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 10/1/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amy Hindsman on Defendant, Carnival Corporation (Hanreck, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Telephone Conference held on 8/28/2019. Total time in court: 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): David Hodges, Robert John Hanreck. Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ado)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David Hodges. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11932118 by Amy Hindsman. Responses due by 9/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of David Hodges, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Hanreck, Robert)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference, re: service of the Complaint, set for 8/28/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. The parties may appear by phone and are instructed to call 1-888-684-8852 on the date and time set forth above. The access code is 3156459 and the password is 5510. FOR CLARITY, PLEASE DO NOT USE A CELL PHONE OR A SPEAKER PHONE. (ps1)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation, John Doe Crewman. (pcs)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11926103, payment transferred from : 19CV23526 Amy Hindsman vs. Carnival Corporation et al, filed by Amy Hindsman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) to Carnival Corporation, #3 Summon(s) to John Doe Crewman)(Hanreck, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hindsman v. Carnival Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Hindsman
Represented By: Robert John Hanreck
Represented By: David Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Adam Cory Finkel
Represented By: William Robert Seitz
Represented By: Curtis Jay Mase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Crewman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?