Sale v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jon Sale, as Receiver
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23561
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 11/4/2019 (Gottlieb, Marc)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Trial set for 8/31/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 8/25/2020 at 9:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Mediation Deadline 5/11/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 Corrected Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jon Sale, as Receiver identifying Other Affiliate Bright Smile Financing, LLC, Other Affiliate BRR Block Inc., Other Affiliate DIGI South LLC, Other Affiliate Ganador Enterprises, LLC, Other Affiliate Media Pay LLC, Other Affiliate Ruderman Family Trust, Other Affiliate Western Alliance Bank, Other Affiliate 1 Global Capital LLC, Other Affiliate 1 West Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Bright Smile Trust, Other Affiliate Carl Ruderman, Other Affiliate Securities and Exchange Commission for Jon Sale, as Receiver (Visconti, Melissa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ail)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 Corrected Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate 1 Global Capital, LLC, Other Affiliate Bright Smile Financing, LLC, Other Affiliate BRR Block Inc., Other Affiliate Ruderman Family Trust, Other Affiliate 1 West Capital, LLC, Other Affiliate Digi South, LLC, Other Affiliate Media Pay, LLC, Other Affiliate Bright Smile Trust, Other Affiliate Carl Ruderman, Other Affiliate Securities and Exchange Commission for J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (De La Cruz, Kimberly)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ail)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Jon Sale, as Receiver (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Visconti, Melissa)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Jon Sale, as Receiver (Visconti, Melissa)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (De La Cruz, Kimberly)
September 27, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. response due 10/21/2019. (ps1)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion Regarding Waiver of Service and Stipulated Time to Respond. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before October 21, 2019. The deadline for compliance with the Order of September 16, 2019 [ECF No. 5] will not be extended. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION Regarding Waiver of Service and Stipulated Time to Respond by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(De La Cruz, Kimberly)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #8 Motion due to the failure to submit a proposed order, as is required by the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION Regarding Waiver of Service and Stipulated Time to Respond by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (De La Cruz, Kimberly)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly De La Cruz on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Attorney Kimberly De La Cruz added to party J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (De La Cruz, Kimberly)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc Jonathan Gottlieb on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Attorney Marc Jonathan Gottlieb added to party J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Gottlieb, Marc)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 10/10/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Certified Mail Receipt by Jon Sale, as Receiver re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Mail Receipt) (Visconti, Melissa) Text Modified on 9/17/2019(ail).
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (amb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11930568, filed by Jon Sale, as Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) - JP Morgan Chase)(Visconti, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sale v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Sale, as Receiver
Represented By: Melissa Damian Visconti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marc Jonathan Gottlieb
Represented By: Kimberly De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?