Early v. Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.
Plaintiff: Sharon Lynn Early
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23567
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING ANSD SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Initial Planning Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)Text Modified on 9/9/2019 (mee).
September 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Sharon Lynn Early (Gurian, Michelle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD. (mee)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11930618, filed by Sharon Lynn Early. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Gurian, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Early v. Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Lynn Early
Represented By: Michelle Yariz Gurian
Represented By: Keith Steven Brais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?