Xport Auto Parts, Inc. v. www.xportautoparts.com et al
Plaintiff: Xport Auto Parts, Inc.
Defendant: Unkown Registrant, Memerio Kernado, Jed Doering, GoDaddy.com, LLC, www.xportautoparts.com and Registrar of Domain Names Reg.Ru, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv23694
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE in light of #12 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Xport Auto Parts, Inc. (Klein, Geremy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process by Xport Auto Parts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Geremy)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Expedited Motion FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Joe Menendez. re #7 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION Preliminary Injunction by Xport Auto Parts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Klein, Geremy)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION Preliminary Injunction by Xport Auto Parts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Geremy)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Xport Auto Parts, Inc. of Filing (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klein, Geremy)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (drz)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (drz)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. (drz)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11957461, filed by Xport Auto Parts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Klein, Geremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xport Auto Parts, Inc. v. www.xportautoparts.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unkown Registrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memerio Kernado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jed Doering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.xportautoparts.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Registrar of Domain Names Reg.Ru, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xport Auto Parts, Inc.
Represented By: Geremy Seth Klein
Represented By: Rafael Recalde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?