The Estate of Omar Fontana et al v. Sauer de Arruda Pinto et al
Appellant: Marise Pereira Fontana Cipriani, Denilda Pereira Fontana, Antonio Celso Cipriani, Devom Consultoria e Partipacoes Ltda, The Estate of Omar Fontana and Emidio Cipriani
Appellee: Alfredo Luiz Kugelmas and Gustavo Henrique Sauer de Arruda Pinto
Case Number: 1:2019cv23700
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Robert Borgo on behalf of Emidio Cipriani. Attorney John Robert Borgo added to party Emidio Cipriani(pty:a). (Borgo, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court of Designated Items, Originally Omitted in Error (ECF #152 and #437) re #11 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court,, (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 ECF #152 in Case # 11-19484, #3 ECF #437 nin Case # 11-19484)(dcn)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 11/8/2019. (jc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 08/15/2019 before Judge A. Jay Cristol, 1-55 pages, Court Reporter: Oulette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2019. (dcn)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Marise Pereira Fontana Cipriani, Devom Consultoria e Partipacoes Ltda, Denilda Pereira Fontana, The Estate of Omar Fontana, Emidio Cipriani, Antonio Celso Cipriani (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's List of Designated Items and Statement of Issues, #3 Appellant's Designated Items Part 1 [ECF #1 - #236], #4 Appellant's Designated Items Part 2 [ECF #239 - #349], #5 Appellant's Designated Items Part 3 [ECF #356 - #515])(dcn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alfredo Luiz Kugelmas, Gustavo Henrique Sauer de Arruda Pinto identifying Corporate Parent OAR Brasil Consultoria Ltda, Corporate Parent Fairland Ltd., Other Affiliate Beatriz Faneca, Other Affiliate Henrique Forssell, Other Affiliate Rodrigo Silva, Other Affiliate Douglass Giuliano, Other Affiliate Krikor Kaysserlian, Other Affiliate Rodrigo Kaysserlian, Other Affiliate Paula Mitie for Alfredo Luiz Kugelmas, Gustavo Henrique Sauer de Arruda Pinto (Grossman, Gregory)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Antonio Celso Cipriani, Emidio Cipriani, Devom Consultoria e Partipacoes Ltda, Marise Pereira Fontana Cipriani, Denilda Pereira Fontana, The Estate of Omar Fontana (Bast, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Antonio Celso Cipriani, Emidio Cipriani, Devom Consultoria e Partipacoes Ltda, Marise Pereira Fontana Cipriani, Denilda Pereira Fontana, The Estate of Omar Fontana (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Dervishi, Brian)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER requiring the parties to file certificates of interested parties by 9/20/19. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nyana Abreu Miller on behalf of Alfredo Luiz Kugelmas, Gustavo Henrique Sauer de Arruda Pinto. Attorney Nyana Abreu Miller added to party Alfredo Luiz Kugelmas(pty:e), Attorney Nyana Abreu Miller added to party Gustavo Henrique Sauer de Arruda Pinto(pty:e). (Miller, Nyana)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 CORRECTED Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Judge Roy K. Altman no longer assigned to case. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Devom Consultoria e Partipaes Ltda, Marise Pereira Fontana Cipriani, Denilda Pereira Fontana, The Estate of Omar Fontana, Emidio Cipriani, Antonio Celso Cipriani (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 11-19484-AJC, filed by Devom Consultoria e Partipaes Ltda, The Estate of Omar Fontana, Marise Pereira Fontana Cipriani, Antonio Celso Cipriani, Denilda Pereira Fontana, Emidio Cipriani.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Omar Fontana et al v. Sauer de Arruda Pinto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Marise Pereira Fontana Cipriani
Represented By: Patricia Ann Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Denilda Pereira Fontana
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Bast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Antonio Celso Cipriani
Represented By: Patricia Ann Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Devom Consultoria e Partipacoes Ltda
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Bast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Estate of Omar Fontana
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Bast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Emidio Cipriani
Represented By: Brian S. Dervishi
Represented By: John Robert Borgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alfredo Luiz Kugelmas
Represented By: Gregory Stewart Grossman
Represented By: Nyana Abreu Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gustavo Henrique Sauer de Arruda Pinto
Represented By: Gregory Stewart Grossman
Represented By: Nyana Abreu Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?