J.G.G. Tobacco Holding Company, Inc. v. Antigua Esteli Tobacoo, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: J.G.G. Tobacco Holding Company, Inc.
Defendant: Antigua Esteli Tobacoo, Corp., Jorge Arturo Garcia and Antigua Esteli Tobacco, Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23732
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by J.G.G. Tobacco Holding Company, Inc. of Filing Defendants' Waiver of Service, and Notice of Serving Court Order [D.E. 5] on the Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Waiver of Service) (Woodard, Jonathan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Entry of Default as to Antigua Esteli Tobacco, Corp., Jorge Arturo Garcia. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/18/2019. (kpe)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Antigua Esteli Tobacoo, Corp., Jorge Arturo Garcia by J.G.G. Tobacco Holding Company, Inc.. (Woodard, Jonathan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by J.G.G. Tobacco Holding Company, Inc.. Antigua Esteli Tobacoo, Corp. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Woodard, Jonathan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by J.G.G. Tobacco Holding Company, Inc.. Jorge Arturo Garcia served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Woodard, Jonathan)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Antigua Esteli Tobacoo, Corp., Jorge Arturo Garcia. (kpe)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (kpe)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antigua Esteli Tobacoo, Corp., Jorge Arturo Garcia. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11963552, filed by J.G.G. Tobacco Holding Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A: Defendants' Website and Social Media, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B: Plaintiff's U.S. Trademark Registration No. 4,350,843, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C: Defendant's Infringing Mark in Tobacco Business Magazine, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D: Defendants' U.S. Trademark Application Serial No. 86/929,908, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E: Defendants' Abandonment of U.S. Trademark Application Serial No. 86/929,908)(Woodard, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.G.G. Tobacco Holding Company, Inc. v. Antigua Esteli Tobacoo, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.G.G. Tobacco Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Ray Woodard
Represented By: John Cyril Malloy, III
Represented By: Meredith Frank Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antigua Esteli Tobacoo, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Arturo Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antigua Esteli Tobacco, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?