Rivas v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Oscar Rivas
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv23756
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2255 case re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Oscar Rivas; Recommending that the Motion to Vacate ECF #1 be DENIED, that Respondent need not file any response, that no Certificate of Appealability be issued, and the case be CLOSED by the Clerk of Court. Objections to R&R due by 11/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America of Filing Transcripts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Porter, Michael)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dayron Silverio on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Silverio, Dayron)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO RESPONDENT TO FILE TRANSCRIPTS on or before October 4, 2019, Respondent shall submit to the Court the transcripts for Movant's change of plea hearing and sentencing hearing so that the Court may promptly examine Movant's Motion to Vacate and determine if a Response is necessary from Respondent., ( Responses due by 10/4/2019) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Porter on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Michael David Porter added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Porter, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Brief in Support of #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Oscar Rivas. (jao)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jao)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 1:18-cr-20572-JEM-1), filed by Oscar Rivas.(jao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivas v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Represented By: Michael David Porter
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?