Martinez Rodriguez v. Warden, Krome SPC et al
Defendant: Warden, Krome SPC, Secretary of Homeland Security, Officer in Charge, Krome Service Processing Center, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Petitioner: Jordan Martinez Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2019cv23764
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Civil Case Terminated, per #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Closing Case. (ps1)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jordan Martinez Rodriguez (Chonillo, Gregory)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 12/9/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jordan Martinez Rodriguez re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case 1:19-cv-23764-CMA (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chonillo, Gregory)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jao)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (jao)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 113C-11970590, filed by Jordan Martinez Rodriguez.(Chonillo, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez Rodriguez v. Warden, Krome SPC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, Krome SPC
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer in Charge, Krome Service Processing Center, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jordan Martinez Rodriguez
Represented By: Gregory Victor Chonillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?