The Spot Classic Barbershop, LLC v. Better Touch Inc.
Plaintiff: The Spot Classic Barbershop, LLC
Defendant: Better Touch INC., Better Touch, Joe Nieves, Sandra Patricia Alvarez, Zandunga Enterprises, Inc. and Joemar Nieves
Case Number: 1:2019cv23766
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Administratively Closing Case) (ls)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Administratively Closing Case upon Notice of Settlement. Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal or Stipulation of Dismissal due 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andres Baltodano on behalf of Better Touch Inc. (Baltodano, Andres)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Summons Returned Executed. Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to follow the instructions when docketing the event, i,e. ATTENTION!!! DO NOT SELECT ANY GROUPS!!! HOLD DOWN THE CONTROL BUTTON (Ctrl) AND SELECT INDIVIDUALS ONLY!!! The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#14]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Spot Classic Barbershop, LLC. Joemar Nieves served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (ls)(See Image at DE #12)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #8 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Spot Classic Barbershop, LLC. All Defendants. (Saade, Gabriel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by The Spot Classic Barbershop, LLC. All Defendants. (Saade, Gabriel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Upcoming Deadline to Serve under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). The Plaintiff is notified, in keeping with Rule 4(m), that the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice unless the Plaintiff timely serves the Defendant by December 9, 2019, or establishes with the Court-before this deadline-that good cause exists for the failure. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Zandunga Enterprises, Inc.. (ls)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by The Spot Classic Barbershop, LLC Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons - ZANDUNGA ENTERPRISES, INC.) (Saade, Gabriel)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joemar Nieves, Zandunga Enterprises, Inc., filed by The Spot Classic Barbershop, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trademark Registration - 5001790, #2 Exhibit Trademark Registration - 5249049)(Saade, Gabriel) Modified Text on 10/7/2019 (ls).
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sandra Patricia Alvarez, Joe Nieves, Better Touch Inc.. (ls)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by The Spot Classic Barbershop, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Summons - Sandra Alvarez, #2 Exhibit Proposed Summons - Joemar Nieves, #3 Exhibit Proposed Summons - Better Touch) (Saade, Gabriel)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 9/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 APPENDIX to #1 Complaint, Exhibit 2 - Trademark Registration 5249049 by The Spot Classic Barbershop, LLC (Saade, Gabriel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (cds)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11970709, filed by The Spot Classic Barbershop, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Trademark Registration - 5001790)(Saade, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Spot Classic Barbershop, LLC v. Better Touch Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Touch INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Touch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Patricia Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zandunga Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joemar Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Spot Classic Barbershop, LLC
Represented By: Gabriel Santiago Saade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?