Verbena Products LLC v. Sesderma USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Verbena Products LLC
Defendant: Sesderma, SL and Sesderma USA LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv23778
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mark Stein; Mediation Hearing set for 2/25/2020 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Verbena Products LLC re #17 Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, of Filing Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fundora, Nicole)
October 31, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS #14 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sesderma USA LLC, Sesderma, SL. Responses due by 11/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sanchelima, Jesus)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters, per DE #17 . (vjk)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two week period beginning 8/17/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 8/11/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Proposed order scheduling mediation, in Word format via email, due by 11/7/19; Mediation Deadline 4/27/2020. REFERRING CASE to for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Verbena Products LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Fundora, Nicole)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Verbena Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- August 13, 2019 email from Walmart, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- August 16, 2019 email to opposing counsel, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- August 26, 2019 email to Serrano)(Fundora, Nicole)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sesderma USA LLC, Sesderma, SL identifying Corporate Parent Pili Siglo XXI, S.L., Other Affiliate Sesderma Italia. S.R.L, Other Affiliate Sesderma, SL SP ZOO (Sucursal Polonia), Other Affiliate Sesderma UK, LTD, Other Affiliate Sesderma RUS, LLC, Other Affiliate Sesderma, GMBH, Other Affiliate Sesderma Colombia, S.A., Other Affiliate Mexsesderma, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Sesderma Puerto Rico, Inc., Other Affiliate Sesderma Dominicana S.R.L., Other Affiliate Sesderma Peru. S.A.C., Other Affiliate Sesderma El Salvador, S.A., Other Affiliate Sesderma Panama, SA, Other Affiliate Sesderma Costa Rica, S.A., Other Affiliate Sesderma Bolivia S.R.L., Other Affiliate Sesderma Laboratorio de Dermocosmeticos LTDA, Other Affiliate Sesderma Guatemala, S.A., Other Affiliate Sesderma India PVT, LTD, Other Affiliate Cecilia Ryle, Other Affiliate Gabriel Serrano for Sesderma USA LLC, Sesderma, SL (Sanchelima, Jesus)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #11 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2019 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sesderma USA LLC, Sesderma, SL. Attorney Jesus Sanchelima added to party Sesderma USA LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jesus Sanchelima added to party Sesderma, SL(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanchelima, Jesus)
September 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/17/2019, per #9 Order. (ps1)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Verbena Products LLC (Guerra, Richard)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 10/17/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) Modified on 9/17/2019 to correct due date (ps1).
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers by October 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Verbena Products LLC. Sesderma USA LLC served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Guerra, Richard)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Verbena Products LLC. Sesderma, SL served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Guerra, Richard)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sesderma USA LLC, Sesderma, SL. (pcs)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sesderma USA LLC, Sesderma, SL. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11972839, filed by Verbena Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Sesderma USA, #3 Summon(s) Sesderma SL, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(Guerra, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verbena Products LLC v. Sesderma USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sesderma, SL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sesderma USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verbena Products LLC
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Represented By: Rafael A. Perez-Pineiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?