Richemond et al v. Equitymax, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Madeleine Richemond and Adrien Richemond
Defendant: United Financial Counselors, Inc., Title Quest Investments, LLC, Stan L. Riskin, Jason Walowitz and Equitymax, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23792
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. THIS MATTER is before the Court on Defendant Stan L. Riskin's motion to dismiss #5 . Plaintiff's response was due October 9, 2019. To date, Plaintiff has failed to file a response. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by November 13, 2019 at 5:00 PM as to why Defendant's motion to dismiss should not be granted by default. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/8/2019. (jws)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 3 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,. US Mail returned for: United Financial Counselors, Inc.. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court, , MOTION TO DISMISS #2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative ( Responses due by 10/9/2019), MOTION for More Definite Statement With Incorporated Memorandum of Law ( Responses due by 10/9/2019) by Stan L. Riskin. (Riskin, Stanley)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Filing of Motion to Withdraw Reference Pursuant to 28 USC 157(d) with District Court (jc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) to Withdraw Reference filed by Stan L. Riskin (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Movant's Designated Items from Case # 19-1202-LMI, #3 Movant's Designated Items from Case # 19-12823-LMI)(dcn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (COMPLAINT) to Withdraw Reference Bankruptcy Court case number 19-1202-LMI., filed by Stan L. Riskin.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richemond et al v. Equitymax, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Counselors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Title Quest Investments, LLC
Represented By: Natalie F. Guerra-Valdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan L. Riskin
Represented By: Stanley L. Riskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Walowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equitymax, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome Lewis Tepps
Represented By: William Andrew Treco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeleine Richemond
Represented By: Julio Cesar Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrien Richemond
Represented By: Julio Cesar Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?