Thomas v. Armstrong et al
Plaintiff: James Thomas
Defendant: Jane Doe, JOHN DOE and Corey Armstrong
Case Number: 1:2019cv23793
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 Declaration regarding income and assets exempt from garnishment signed by: Corey J. Armstrong re #8 Answer to Complaint by Corey Armstrong (ebz)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Pro Se Notice of Appearance by Corey Armstrong re #8 Answer to Complaint (ebz)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corey Armstrong re #8 Answer to Complaint (ebz)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Corey Armstrong. (ebz)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by James Thomas. Corey Armstrong served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Printy, Gary)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by James Thomas re #1 Complaint, CIVIL COVER SHEET (Printy, Gary)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ebz)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Corey Armstrong. (ebz)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Corey Armstrong, JOHN DOE, Jane Doe. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11974990, filed by James Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) for issuance to SERGEANT COREY ARMSTRONG)(Printy, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Armstrong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thomas
Represented By: Gary Lee Printy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?