Villars v. Secretary of the State of Florida
Plaintiff: Janvier Villars
Defendant: Peggy Stroker, AKAM On-site Inc., Steven and Goldwyn, P.A., Mordechai Zarger, The State of Florida, Secretary of the State of Florida, Liliana Calderon, First Services Residential, The Enterprise, Olesya Arkhipova, Iliana Muxo, Alma Abreu and Leigh Katzman
Case Number: 1:2019cv23794
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, , #9 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, #8 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, (Joinder) filed by Janvier Villars. (For Image See DE#10 ) Replies due by 11/12/2019. (drz)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Consolidation of Cases 19-CV-23794-001 with CV 23932-01 and Response to Defendants Represented by CNA Insurance on Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice by Janvier Villars. Responses due by 11/18/2019 (drz)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, #8 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, (Joinder) by AKAM On-site Inc.. Attorney Mark Murray Heinish added to party AKAM On-site Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/8/2019 (Heinish, Mark)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, by Alma Abreu, Olesya Arkhipova, Liliana Calderon, First Services Residential, Iliana Muxo, Mordechai Zarger. Attorney Mark Murray Heinish added to party Alma Abreu(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Murray Heinish added to party Olesya Arkhipova(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Murray Heinish added to party Liliana Calderon(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Murray Heinish added to party First Services Residential(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Murray Heinish added to party Iliana Muxo(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Murray Heinish added to party Mordechai Zarger(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, #9 Exhibit Ex. I, #10 Exhibit Ex. J, #11 Exhibit Ex. K, #12 Exhibit Ex. L, #13 Exhibit Ex. M, #14 Exhibit Ex. N, #15 Exhibit Ex. O, #16 Exhibit Ex. P, #17 Exhibit Ex. Q, #18 Exhibit Ex. R, #19 Exhibit Ex. S, #20 Exhibit Ex. T, #21 Exhibit Ex. U, #22 Exhibit Ex. V)(Heinish, Mark)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, by AKAM On-site Inc.. Attorney Lana Rachel Dolnick added to party AKAM On-site Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT, AKAM ON-SITE INC.S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT)(Dolnick, Lana)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for all pre-trial matters. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 9/12/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100194306. (vt)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and pay the correct fees of $400.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (jas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against AKAM On-site Inc., Alma Abreu, Olesya Arkhipova, Liliana Calderon, First Services Residential, Iliana Muxo, Secretary of the State of Florida, Steven and Goldwyn, P.A., Peggy Stroker, The Enterprise, The State of Florida, Mordechai Zarger. Filing fee $ 400.00 not paid, filed by Janvier Villars. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villars v. Secretary of the State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Stroker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKAM On-site Inc.
Represented By: Lana Rachel Dolnick
Represented By: Mark Murray Heinish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven and Goldwyn, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mordechai Zarger
Represented By: Mark Murray Heinish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liliana Calderon
Represented By: Mark Murray Heinish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Services Residential
Represented By: Mark Murray Heinish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Enterprise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olesya Arkhipova
Represented By: Mark Murray Heinish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iliana Muxo
Represented By: Mark Murray Heinish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma Abreu
Represented By: Mark Murray Heinish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janvier Villars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?