Rohe v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Appellant: Susan Lynne Rohe
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Case Number: 1:2019cv23805
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Keith Winston on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Attorney Michael Keith Winston added to party Wells Fargo Bank, NA(pty:e). (Winston, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Staying Case Upon Notice Of Bankruptcy; The Court thus stays this case until the conclusion of Lee Rohes bankruptcy proceedings as they pertain to the res at issue in this case. The Court orders Wells Fargo to file status reports advising this Court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings every 120 days; the first one is due by December 11, 2019. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to close this matter during the pendency of the stay. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to #14 Notice (Other), #15 Response/Reply (Other) Reply in Relation to Notice Regarding Bankruptcy Filing by Appellant/Debtor's Spouse and Request for Stay by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Morande, Dean)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on August 27, 2019 before Judge A. Jay Cristol, 1-17 pages, Court Reporter: OUELLETTE & MAULDIN COURT REPORTERS, INC. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2019. (lle)
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Susan Lynne Rohe (RE:Bankruptcy Case #19-1224-AJC (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation, #2 APPELLANT'S DESIGNATED ITEMS, #3 Docket Sheet)(lle)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #14 Notice (Other) Request For Stay by Susan Lynne Rohe. (Rohe, Lee)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, NA Notice Regardng Bankruptcy Filing By Appellant/Debtor's Spouse and Request for Stay (Morande, Dean)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Susan Lynne Rohe (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION, #3 APPELLANT STMT OF ISSUES, #4 NT'S DESIGNATED ITEMS 19-1196, #5 APPELLANT'S DESIGNATED ITEMS 19-1224, #6 APPELLANT'S DESIGNATED ITEMS 19-12053)(lle)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on August 22, 2019 before Judge A. Jay Cristol, 1-20 pages, Court Reporter: Margaret Franzen. Telephone number: 305-358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2019. (lle)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on July 30, 2019 before Judge A. Jay Cristol, 1-17 pages, Court Reporter: Helayne Wills. Telephone number: 305-358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2019. (lle)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 10/31/2019. (jc)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Susan Lynne Rohe (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 APPELLANT DESIGNATIONS, #3 STATEMENT OF ISSUES, #4 APPELLANT'S DESIGNATED ITEMS 19-1196, #5 APPELLANT DESIGNATED ITEMS 19-12053, #6 APPELLANT'S DESIGNATED ITEMS 19-1224, #7 CLAIM BY WELLS FARGO, #8 RESTRICTED TRANSCRIPT OF HRG. 8.20.19, #9 RESTRICTED TRANSCRIPT OF HRG. 8.22.19)(lle)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Consolidating Related Cases; granting #5 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Susan Lynne Rohe. Responses due by 10/9/2019 (Rohe, Lee)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Request for consent to transfer in furtherance of motion to consolidate by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Responses due by 10/1/2019 (Morande, Dean)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Attorney Dean Angelo Morande added to party Wells Fargo Bank, NA(pty:e). Responses due by 9/30/2019 (Morande, Dean)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Susan Lynne Rohe (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 19-1224-AJC, filed by Susan Lynne Rohe.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rohe v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Susan Lynne Rohe
Represented By: Lee Robert Rohe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: David L. Gay
Represented By: Michael Keith Winston
Represented By: Dean Angelo Morande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?