PNC Bank, NA v. Brickell Restaurante, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, NA
Defendant: PIACERE NEWS & CAFE CORP., Brickell Restaurante, LLC, Sunny Isles Beach Restaurant Corp., Gladys Ulloa Scolnick and GODIVA AMERICAN, CORP.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23806
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Joan A Lenard
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of PNC Bank, NA against Brickell Restaurante, LLC, Godiva American, Corp., Piacere News & Cafe Corp., Sunny Isles Beach Restaurant Corp., and Gladys Ulloa Scolnick. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (gie)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion for Default Judgment. An Amended Final Judgment will be docketed by separate entry. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/30/2019. (gie)
October 29, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Default Judgment by PNC Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cooke, Adam)
October 29, 2019 Filing 26 FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of PNC Bank, NA against Brickell Restaurante, LLC, Piacere News & Cafe Corp., Sunny Isles Beach Restaurant Corp., Gladys Ulloa Scolnick. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (gie)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING PNC Bank, National Association's #22 Motion for Default Judgment. Final Default Judgment will be docketed by separate entry. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/29/2019. (gie)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On October 28, 2019, the Clerk entered default #23 against Defendant Godiva American, Corp. for failure to respond to the Complaint or otherwise appear in this action. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff is provided until and including November 7, 2019 to file a Motion for Entry of FINAL Default Judgment, together with appropriate affidavits and documentation, against Defendant Godiva American, Corp. or show cause why this case should not be dismissed as to Godiva American, Corp. for lack of prosecution. This entry constitutes the ENDORSED ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/28/2019. (gie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 Clerks Entry of Default as to Godiva American, Corp. - Motions Terminated: #21 Renewed Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/28/2019. (ls)
October 26, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by PNC Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cooke, Adam)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 Renewed MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Godiva American, Corp. by PNC Bank, NA. (Cooke, Adam)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by PNC Bank, NA. (Cooke, Adam)
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER by Clerk of Non-Entry of Default re #18 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Godiva American, Corp.. Reason: Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed OR Waiver of Service Executed - has incorrect party name listed. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/24/2019. (ls)
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Godiva American, Corp. by PNC Bank, NA. (Cooke, Adam)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On October 10, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Return of Service indicating that Defendant Godiva American, Corp. was served on September 30, 2019. (D.E. #10 .) Over twenty-one days have now passed, and Defendant Godiva American, Corp. has not filed a response. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff shall have ten (10) days from the date of this Order within which to file a Motion for Default as to Defendant Godiva American, Corp. or show cause why this case should not be dismissed as to Defendant Godiva American, Corp. for lack of prosecution. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/22/2019. (gie)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On October 18, 2019, the Clerk entered default #15 against Defendant Brickell Restaurante, LLC for failure to respond to the Complaint or otherwise appear in this action. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff is provided until and including October 28, 2019 to file a Motion for Entry of FINAL Default Judgment, together with appropriate affidavits and documentation, against the above-named Defendant or show cause why this case should not be dismissed as to the above-named Defendant for lack of prosecution. This entry constitutes the ENDORSED ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/18/2019. (gie)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 Clerks Entry of Default as to Brickell Restaurante, LLC - Motions Terminated: #14 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/18/2019. (ls)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Brickell Restaurante, LLC by PNC Bank, NA. (Cooke, Adam)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On September 30, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Return of Service indicating that Defendant Brickell Restaurante, LLC was served on September 20, 2019. (D.E. #4 .) Over twenty-one days have now passed, and Defendant Brickell Restaurante, LLC has not filed a response. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff shall have ten (10) days from the date of this Order within which to file a Motion for Default as to Defendant Brickell Restaurante, LLC or show cause why this case should not be dismissed as to Defendant Brickell Restaurante, LLC for lack of prosecution. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/15/2019. (gie)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On October 10, 2019, the Clerk entered default #11 against Defendants Sunny Isles Beach Restaurant Corp., Piacere News & Cafe Corp., and Gladys Ulloa Scolnick for failure to respond to the Complaint or otherwise appear in this action. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff is provided until and including October 25, 2019 to file a Motion for Entry of FINAL Default Judgment, together with appropriate affidavits and documentation, against the above-named Defendants or show cause why this case should not be dismissed as to the above-named Defendants for lack of prosecution. This entry constitutes the ENDORSED ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/15/2019. (gie)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Entry of Default as to Sunny Isles Beach Restaurant Corp., Piacere News & Cafe Corp., Gladys Ulloa Scolnick - Motions Terminated: #9 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/11/2019. (mc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by PNC Bank, NA. Godiva American, Corp. served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Cooke, Adam)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Piacere News & Cafe Corp., Gladys Ulloa Scolnick, Sunny Isles Beach Restaurant Corp. by PNC Bank, NA. (Cooke, Adam)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On September 30, 2019, Plaintiff filed Returns of Service indicating that Defendants Sunny Isles Beach Restaurant Corp. (D.E. #5 ), PIACERE NEWS & CAFE CORP. (D.E. #6 ), and Gladys Ulloa Scolnick (D.E. #7 ) were served on September 16, 2019. Over twenty-one days have now passed, and those Defendants have not filed a response. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff shall have ten (10) days from the date of this Order within which to file a Motion for Default as to the above-named Defendants or show cause why this case should not be dismissed as to those Defendants for lack of prosecution. This entry constitutes the ENDORSED ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/8/2019. (gie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by PNC Bank, NA. Gladys Ulloa Scolnick served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Cooke, Adam)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by PNC Bank, NA. PIACERE NEWS & CAFE CORP. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Cooke, Adam)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by PNC Bank, NA. Sunny Isles Beach Restaurant Corp. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Cooke, Adam)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by PNC Bank, NA. Brickell Restaurante, LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Cooke, Adam)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brickell Restaurante, LLC, GODIVA AMERICAN, CORP., PIACERE NEWS & CAFE CORP., Gladys Ulloa Scolnick, Sunny Isles Beach Restaurant Corp.. (amb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11977890, filed by PNC Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s))(Cooke, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, NA v. Brickell Restaurante, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIACERE NEWS & CAFE CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brickell Restaurante, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny Isles Beach Restaurant Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladys Ulloa Scolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GODIVA AMERICAN, CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, NA
Represented By: Robert Dewitt McIntosh
Represented By: Adam B. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?