Castanos v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alejandra Castano
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv23809
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #12 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, #13 Transmittal Letter Sent (cds)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order of Remand to: : 11th Judicial Circuit Court. State Court Case Number: 19-023620-CA-01 (cqs)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Remand to State Court. Closing Case. Motions Terminated: #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Alejandra Castano. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Markel Arrizabalaga. (Kelly, Donald)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. Replies due by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kelly, Donald)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kelly, Donald)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 State Court Documents)(Kelly, Donald)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for two-week period starting 6/8/2020 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 6/2/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alejandra Castano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Pardo, Erika)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kelly, Donald)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - In the Circuit of the 11th Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11978113, filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Donald) Text Modified on 9/12/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castanos v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: William Roderick Lewis
Represented By: Donald Grayson Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra Castano
Represented By: Erika Leigh Pardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?