Rodriguez v. HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Plaintiff: Antonia Rodriguez
Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Case Number: 1:2019cv23810
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order And Order Of Referral To Mediation: (Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 9/22/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Murphy, Eugene)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Policy, #2 Exhibit Denial Letter)(Murphy, Eugene)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11978259, filed by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mercadante, Gabrielle) Modified text on 9/12/2019 (ar2). (No answer/motion to dismiss filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonia Rodriguez
Represented By: Maximo Alexander Santiago
Represented By: Anthony Manuel Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Represented By: Gabrielle R Mercadante
Represented By: Eugene P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?