Montero Risco v. Swacina et al
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr, Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli, Deputy Director Mark Koumans, Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan and Linda Swacina
Petitioner: Efrain Leonidas Eduard Montero Risco
Case Number: 1:2019cv23901
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Administratively Closing Case Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal and Suggestion of Mootness by Efrain Leonidas Eduard Montero Risco (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Teal, Kyle)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Efrain Leonidas Eduard Montero Risco of Proof of Service of Kenneth T. Cuccinelli (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Teal, Kyle)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Efrain Leonidas Eduard Montero Risco of Proof of Service of William Barr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Teal, Kyle)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Efrain Leonidas Eduard Montero Risco of Proof of Service of Kevin McAleenan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Teal, Kyle)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Efrain Leonidas Eduard Montero Risco of Proof of Service of Mark Koumans (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Teal, Kyle)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Efrain Leonidas Eduard Montero Risco of Proof of Service of Linda Swacina (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Teal, Kyle)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski on behalf of William Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Mark Koumans, Kevin McAleenan, Linda Swacina. Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party William Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party Kenneth Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party Mark Koumans(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party Kevin McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party Linda Swacina(pty:dft). (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to William Barr (ail)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Proposed Summons by Efrain Leonidas Eduard Montero Risco re #1 Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency, (Teal, Kyle)Text Modified on 9/20/2019 (ail).
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( Show Cause Hearing set for 12/13/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.), ( Reply due by 11/8/2019.) Show Cause Response due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 19, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing: Hearing set for 12/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. SEE DE #6 ORDER (ail)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice of Receipt of additional Filing Fee received on 9/19/2019 in the amount of $ 353.00, receipt number FLS100194873. (vt)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance with Payment of Correct Filing Fee by Efrain Leonidas Eduard Montero Risco re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Teal, Kyle)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Mark Koumans, Kevin McAleenan, Linda Swacina. (amb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Insufficient filing fee paid. Filer must file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee and electronically pay the correct fees of $400 within 24 hours. (amb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION (Complaint) Judicial Review of Denial of Application for Naturalization Pursuant to 8 USC 1421(c) and Request for De Novo Hearing RE: Government Agency US Citizenship and Immigration Services. Filing fee $ 47.00 receipt number 113C-11995395, filed by Efrain Leonidas Eduard Montero Risco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Teal, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montero Risco v. Swacina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Director Mark Koumans
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Swacina
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Efrain Leonidas Eduard Montero Risco
Represented By: Kyle Brandon Teal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?